Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 06/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/19/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014