Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/13/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/27/2013