Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/31/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/18/2014