Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/30/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/04/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/15/2013