There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Collectible Firearms Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Arms Export Control Act to provide that certain firearms listed as curios or relics may be imported into the United States by a licensed importer without obtaining authorization from the Department of State or the Department of Defense, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/19/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/04/2013Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2013Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/27/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/10/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/15/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/10/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/04/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/04/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade06/19/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2247.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2247. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2013)

Collectible Firearms Protection Act - Amends the Arms Export Control Act to allow the importation of certain firearms listed as curios or relics into the United States by a licensed importer without the requirement of an authorization from or payment to the Department of State or the Department of Defense (DOD) upon certification to the Attorney General that such firearms are lawfully possessed under the laws of the exporting country.