Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 09/11/2013