Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 06/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/29/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/12/2013