Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/20/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-60.
12/20/2013 Signed by President.
12/19/2013 Presented to President.
12/17/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2013 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8917-8918)
09/28/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 4 (Roll no. 496).(text: CR 9/27/2013 H5890-5891)
09/27/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-234.
06/04/2013 Introduced in House