Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/21/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/06/2013