Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/05/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 06/05/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/10/2014