Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/30/2013