There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Great Lakes Navigation System Sustainability Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement a program establishing the Great Lakes Navigation System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/06/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/07/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/06/2013Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/24/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/19/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/06/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/07/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2273.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2273. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2013)

Great Lakes Navigation System Sustainability Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of the Army, acting through the Chief of Engineers, to manage and allocate funding for all commercial and recreational navigation projects in the Great Lakes Navigation System as components of a single system, recognizing the interdependence of the projects.

Directs the Secretary, acting through the Chief of Engineers, to: (1) establish a program to fund eligible operations and maintenenace projects of the System to their authorized depths and widths, and (2) give higher priority to projects at certain harbors in which a 50% non-federal share of costs of eligible operations and maintenance expenses is provided.