Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 08/01/2013