Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/03/2013