Committees: H.R.2279 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/06/2013 Referred to
06/19/2013 Markup by
07/30/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-179
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy06/07/2013 Referred to
05/17/2013 Hearings by
06/06/2013 Markup by
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/06/2013 Referred to
11/01/2013 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/07/2013 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works01/13/2014 Referred to