There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Internet Gambling Regulation, Enforcement, and Consumer Protection Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To regulate Internet gambling, to provide consumer protections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/06/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/07/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/12/2014

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/06/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade06/07/2013 Referred to
House Financial Services06/06/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary06/06/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2282. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2013)

Internet Gambling Regulation, Enforcement, and Consumer Protection Act of 2013 - Prohibits operation of an Internet gambling facility that offers services to persons in the United States, except as authorized under this Act. Provides exceptions with respect to licensed race tracks, operators offering lottery transactions or services relating to bets or wagers by a state or Indian tribe, and persons engaged outside the United States in bet or wager activities that are initiated, received, or made solely by individuals outside the United States.

Establishes within the Treasury the Office of Internet Gambling Oversight, headed by an Executive Director. Outlines requirements for the designation of entities for the regulation and oversight of authorized Internet gambling facilities. Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to withdraw such designation in appropriate circumstances. Includes the Office as such an entity.

Directs the Secretary to establish and carry out an application and licensing program for such facilities, including suitability qualifications and disqualification standards. Provides for disciplinary procedures and civil penalties against licensee violators.

Requires each designated entity, before issuing a facility license, to provide for the development of a compulsive gaming, responsible gaming, and self-exclusion program, to be implemented by each licensee.

Allows gambling at such facilities only with respect to bets or wagers from individuals located in states and Indian lands that have opted-in for participation in such gaming. Provides for opt-in and opt-out elections.

Prohibits this Act from being construed to authorize a licensee to accept a wager on any sporting event in violation of a federal or state law.

Makes it a violation of this Act to operate a place of public accommodation in which computer terminals or similar devices are made available principally for accessing such facilities.

Prohibits Internet gambling cheating and the use of cheating devices and provides enforcement authority.

Authorizes designated entities to issue initial licenses before the authorized date of first issuance under this Act (270 days after enactment).

Requires annual reports from the Secretary to Congress on the licensing and regulation of such facilities and on practices to protect consumers with respect to such gambling.

Directs the Secretary to require the independent testing of hardware, software, communications equipment, and other necessary devices for such facilities to ensure their integrity, accountability, randomness of play, and network security.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish and implement programs for the identification, prevention, and treatment of pathological and other problem gambling.

Directs the Treasury Secretary to compile and make publicly available datasets on player gambling behavior.

Provides for enforcement of provisions of this Act through the federal criminal code and federal financial transaction requirements.