Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/11/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/11/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/17/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/30/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/15/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/30/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/09/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/05/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/10/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/11/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/11/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/25/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/10/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/10/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/10/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/10/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/22/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/23/2014