Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/17/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/24/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/25/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/17/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/09/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/03/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/03/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/10/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/16/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/16/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/14/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/03/2014