Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
07/25/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-22.
07/25/2013 Signed by President.
07/17/2013 Presented to President.
07/11/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/11/2013 Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5672)
06/25/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4006-4007)
06/06/2013 Introduced in House