Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/10/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2013