Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/08/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-149.
08/08/2014 Signed by President.
08/04/2014 Presented to President.
08/01/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5330)
07/31/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
07/14/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6160)
06/06/2013 Introduced in House