Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/10/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 01/10/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/29/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/29/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/11/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/04/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/04/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/13/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/26/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/20/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/30/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/25/2014