Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/02/2014