Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/25/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/25/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/09/2013