Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/20/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/04/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew