Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2014