Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/23/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 11/12/2014