Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/01/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/23/2013