Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/13/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/15/2013