Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/11/2013