Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/17/2013