Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/11/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/12/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/12/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/13/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/13/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/13/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 09/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/27/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/27/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/14/2014