Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/28/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/17/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/16/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/13/2014