Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014