Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/20/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/10/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/23/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/23/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/08/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/10/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/21/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/21/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/21/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/24/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/02/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/01/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/08/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/28/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014