There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Facility Accountability Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Facility Accountability Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 with respect to the applicability of the Act to Federal facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/01/2013Committee on Transportation discharged.
07/30/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-180, Part I.
06/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date All Actions
11/01/2013Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 184.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2013Committee on Transportation discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2013Provisions of this measure incorporated into H.R. 2279.
07/30/2013House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 1, 2013.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-180, Part I.
06/19/2013Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 18.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/19/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/18/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/14/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/12/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/11/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2013Consideration and Mark-up Session Held by the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Prior to Introduction.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy
06/06/2013Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
05/17/2013Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/12/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce06/11/2013 Referred to
06/19/2013 Markup by
07/30/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-180
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy06/14/2013 Referred to
05/17/2013 Hearings by
06/06/2013 Markup by
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/11/2013 Referred to
11/01/2013 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/12/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2318. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (07/30/2013)

Federal Facility Accountability Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 (CERCLA) to apply all guidelines, rules, regulations, and criteria applicable to response actions (currently, preliminary assessments) to address hazardous substances at facilities to those currently or formerly owned or operated by the United States.

Requires federal facilities to comply with state substantive and procedural requirements regarding response relating to hazardous substances or pollutants or contaminants, including state hazardous waste requirements, in the same manner and to the same extent as any nongovernmental entity. Waives sovereign immunity with respect to state substantive or procedural requirements. Prohibits an agent, employee, or officer of the United States from being: (1) immune or exempt from injunctive relief with respect to such state requirements, and (2) personally liable for any civil penalty under such requirements or CERCLA with respect to any act or omission within the scope of their official duties.

Provides that state substantive and procedural requirements include administrative orders, injunctive relief, civil and administrative penalties and fines, reasonable service charges or oversight costs, and laws or regulations requiring the imposition and maintenance of engineering or land use controls.

(Sec. 3) Authorizes the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to review as determined necessary, or upon state request, actions taken or regulations promulgated pursuant to any duties or powers delegated or assigned by the President to a department, agency, or instrumentality of the United States other than EPA to ensure consistency with the guidelines, rules, regulations, or criteria established by the Administrator.