There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify certain provisions of the Native American Veterans' Memorial Establishment Act of 1994.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/26/2013Became Public Law No: 113-70. (TXT | PDF)
12/26/2013Signed by President.
12/23/2013Presented to President.
12/20/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9068)
12/11/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 633).(text: CR H7639)
12/11/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-287.
06/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
12/26/2013Became Public Law No: 113-70. (TXT | PDF)
12/26/2013Signed by President.
12/23/2013HousePresented to President.
12/20/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9068)
12/12/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/11/2013-4:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 633). (text: CR H7639)
12/11/2013-4:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7666-7667)
12/11/2013-12:42pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/11/2013-12:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2319.
12/11/2013-12:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7639-7640)
12/11/2013-12:31pmHouseMr. Mullin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/11/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 207.
12/11/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-287.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013HouseSubcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013HouseSubcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/23/2013HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs
06/18/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/18/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/11/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/11/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (15)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/11/2013
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/17/2013 07/16/2013 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/11/2013 Referred to
12/04/2013 Markup by
12/11/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-287
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/18/2013 Referred to
12/04/2013 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs06/18/2013 Referred to
07/23/2013 Hearings by
12/04/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2319. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-70 (12/26/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 11, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013 - Amends the Native American Veterans' Memorial Establishment Act of 1994 to authorize the construction of the National Native American Veterans' Memorial on the property under the jurisdiction of the National Museum of the American Indian on the National Mall. (Currently, its location is restricted to the interior structure of the Museum.)

Authorizes the Museum to participate in the selection of the Memorial's design, on more than a consultative basis, with the National Congress of American Indians.

Makes the Museum and the National Congress of American Indians responsible for accepting contributions for, and paying the expenses of, establishing the Memorial. (Currently, the National Congress of American Indians is solely responsible for those duties.)