Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/12/2013