Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/14/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/04/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/25/2014