Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/28/2014