Committees: H.R.2337 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/12/2013 Referred to
07/24/2013 Markup by
09/10/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-196
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/20/2013 Referred to
07/19/2013 Hearings by
07/24/2013 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/30/2013 Referred to
12/19/2013 Markup by
05/22/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-173