Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/29/2014