Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/13/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/20/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2014