Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/30/2013