Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/17/2013