Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-212. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014 Signed by President.
12/10/2014 Presented to President.
12/04/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6354)
12/02/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 3 (Roll no. 539).(text: CR H8255-8256)
06/13/2013 Introduced in House