Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/25/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/08/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/08/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/14/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/14/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/17/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/17/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/17/2014
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 07/17/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/25/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/25/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/25/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/25/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/25/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/25/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/29/2014