Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/02/2014