Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/03/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/27/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/27/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/08/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/08/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/08/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/08/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/02/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/21/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/14/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/17/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/17/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/17/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/17/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/17/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/17/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/17/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 07/17/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/17/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/25/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/25/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/25/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/25/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/25/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/25/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/25/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/25/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/25/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/25/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/25/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/29/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/29/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/29/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/29/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/01/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 08/01/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 08/01/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/09/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014