Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 07/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/27/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/25/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/25/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/25/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/25/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/26/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/03/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/03/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/08/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/02/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/23/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/14/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/14/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/14/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/14/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/14/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/14/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/14/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/14/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/14/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/14/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/14/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/14/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/14/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/17/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/17/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/17/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/25/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/25/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/25/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/25/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/25/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/25/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/25/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/25/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/25/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/25/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/29/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/29/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/29/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/29/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/29/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/29/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/17/2014